Hugunin v. City of Tampa, Florida et al (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Harvey William Hugunin
Defendant: Hillsborough County, Florida and City of Tampa, Florida
Case Number: 1:2020cv00018
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the Report and Recommendation under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(b). It is ORDERED, for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, which the court adopts and incorporates into its ruling, that each of the above-captioned cases are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ordered that Huguinn's IFP Applications be DENIED as moot with no filing fee assessed. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 03/02/20. (copy mailed to Harvey William Hugunin, General Delivery, Chattanooga, TN 37401) (JBR)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Harvey William Hugunin. (BDG)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Harvey William Hugunin. (KFB)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Harvey Hugunin. (BDG)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION to (8 in 1:20-cv-00010-PLR-SKL, 10 in 1:20-cv-00006-PLR-SKL, 12 in 1:20-cv-00007-PLR-SKL, 5 in 1:20-cv-00012-PLR-SKL, 13 in 1:20-cv-00009-PLR-SKL, 6 in 1:20-cv-00013-PLR-SKL, 7 in 1:20-cv-00018-PLR-SKL) Report and Recommendations, filed by Harvey William Hugunin. (AWS)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Harvey Hugunin. (AWS)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 1:20-cv-00012-PLR-SKL) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey William Hugunin, (2 in 1:20-cv-00010-PLR-SKL) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey William Hugunin, (2 in 1:20-cv-00006-PLR-SKL) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey William Hugunin, (3 in 1:20-cv-00009-PLR-SKL) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey William Hugunin, (1 in 1:20-cv-00013-PLR-SKL) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey William Hugunin, (1 in 1:20-cv-00007-PLR-SKL) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey William Hugunin, (2 in 1:20-cv-00018-PLR-SKL) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey William Hugunin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 1/23/2020. (BDG)Report mailed to Hugunin. Order serviced to Chief Judge Pamela Reeves.
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Harvey William Hugunin. (KFB)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Administrative Notice to Harvey William Hugunin #4 Letter : Serviced via US Mail to Mr. Hugunin. (KFB)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Harvey William Hugunin. (KFB)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 1/17/20. This Order serviced via US Mail to Harvey William Hugunin.(KFB)
January 15, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (KFB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harvey William Hugunin. (KFB)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Harvey William Hugunin. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)(KFB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hugunin v. City of Tampa, Florida et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tampa, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey William Hugunin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?