Bledsoe v. Tennessee Valley Authority Board of Directors
Plaintiff: Robert Bledsoe
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority Board of Directors
Case Number: 1:2020cv00029
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bledsoe. Tennessee Valley Authority Board of Directors served on 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Summons Return General Counsel, #2 Other Summons Return USA ESTN)(Hamill, Douglas)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/27/2020. (CAT)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/27/2020. (CAT)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/27/2020. (CAT)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tennessee Valley Authority Board of Directors, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons General Counsel, #2 Summons US Attorney for Eastern District Tennessee)(CAT)
January 27, 2020 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CAT)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tennessee Valley Authority Board of Directors ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4208297.), filed by Robert Bledsoe. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AG US Summons, #3 Summons General Counsel Quirk Summons, #4 Summons USA EDT Summons)(Hamill, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bledsoe v. Tennessee Valley Authority Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bledsoe
Represented By: Douglas S Hamill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?