Warren & Griffin, P.C. et al v. Monge & Associates, P.C. (TV1)
Plaintiff: Warren & Griffin, P.C., John Mark Griffin and C. Mark Warren
Defendant: Monge & Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00076
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motion to Dismiss Pending Resolution of Motion for Remand filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John)
May 19, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Monge & Associates, P.C. (Jackson, John)
May 19, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (BJL)
May 18, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen)
May 11, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration of John G. Jackson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Jackson, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Stay filed by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, John)
April 27, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by C. Mark Warren, John Mark Griffin, Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of C. Mark Warren, #2 Exhibit Declaration of John Mark Griffin, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Warren for Warren and Griffin, P.C.)(Duggins, Stephen)
April 20, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support : requirements due by 4/24/2020. *Please refile Motion and Memorandum in Support as separate documents. (BJL)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney. Robert C. Khayat on behalf of Monge & Associates, P.C. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 04/09/2020. (KRS) Modified on 4/10/2020 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Robert C. Khayat
April 9, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorney Khayat regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4298721.) filed by Monge & Associates, P.C. as to Monge & Associates, P.C. (SAC)
April 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4298721.) by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jackson, John)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/14/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/8/20. (JBR)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on April 1, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC) Modified on 4/1/2020, Order mailed to Attorney Khayat. (SAC).
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint until April 15, 2020 by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Warren & Griffin, P.C.. (Duggins, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/25/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/25/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/25/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Robert C. Khayat, Jr. is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Robert C. Khayat, Jr.) (CAT)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Supplement : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
March 25, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Jackson, John)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chancery Court for Hamilton County, Tennessee, case number 20-0141. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4281644), filed by Monge & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jackson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren & Griffin, P.C. et al v. Monge & Associates, P.C. (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren & Griffin, P.C.
Represented By: Stephen S Duggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mark Griffin
Represented By: Stephen S Duggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Mark Warren
Represented By: Stephen S Duggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monge & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: John G Jackson
Represented By: Robert C Khayat, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?