DPBTB LLC v. The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company
Plaintiff: DPBTB LLC and DPBTB, LLC
Defendant: The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00142
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Reed Willis filed by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company. (Williamson, Charles)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Malvin Gene Simmons by DPBTB, LLC. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Don Johnson by DPBTB, LLC. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DPBTB, LLC. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Reed Willis by DPBTB, LLC. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Accordingly, the Joint Motion for Extension [Doc. 13] is GRANTED IN PART. The parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer in accordance with Rule 26(f) and this Court's Order on or before August 10, 2020 [Doc. 7]. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) Report and Notice of Consent/Non-Consent on or before August 24, 2020. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/21/2020. (CAT)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion of Reid Willis by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Deed, #2 Exhibit 2: Comps - Co-Star Report, #3 Exhibit 3: Broker Opinion of Value 07.13.20)(Williamson, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Map of Chattanooga, Hamilton Co., TN)(Williamson, Charles)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Rule 26(f) Report and Notice of Consent / NonConsent by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company. (Williamson, Charles)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DPBTB, LLC. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Robert J Uhorchuk re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court : requirements due by 7/13/2020. (AWS)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by DPBTB, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Affidavit)(Uhorchuk, Robert)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by DPBTB, LLC. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by DPBTB, LLC. (AML)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Filing Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate) (AML)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conference unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basisof their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 06/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent / Non Consent)(CAT)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company.(Williamson, Charles)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/5/20. (GRE)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/5/20. (GRE)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/5/20. (GRE)
June 5, 2020 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company. (Williamson, Charles)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Chancery Court, case number 20-0285. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4363989), filed by The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Exhibit C: Notice to State Court & Notice to Counsel, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Williamson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DPBTB LLC v. The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DPBTB LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DPBTB, LLC
Represented By: Robert J Uhorchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alabama Great Southern Railroad Company
Represented By: Charles H Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?