Duncan v. 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership et al (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Hubert Duncan
Defendant: 84 Lumber Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership
3Rd Party Defendant: U.S. Lumber Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00202
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by U.S. Lumber Group, LLC (Stackhouse, Mary)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order. (AWS)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for enlargement of time. U.S. Lumber Group, LLC shall respond to the Third-Party Complaint by September 25, 2020. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/4/2020. This docket entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. (PAF)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION For Enlargement of Time re #10 Third Party Complaint, by U.S. Lumber Group, LLC. (Stackhouse, Mary)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 Informational only, Administrative Notice to Counsel re #12 Subpoena Returned Executed. (SAC)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Lumber Group, LLC on August 14, 2020 (Pratt, P) Modified on 8/24/2020, to update docket text from subpoena returned to summons returned. (SAC).
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to U.S. Lumber Group, LLC. (AWS)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against U.S. Lumber Group, LLC, filed by 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Terms and Conditions of Purchase, #2 Exhibit B-6-26-20 Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C-7-22-20 Rejection Letter, #4 Summons)(Pratt, P)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by 84 Lumber Company, 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership.(Pratt, P)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Warren Diegel on behalf of 84 Lumber Company, 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership (Diegel, Nicholas)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/22/20. (GRE)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/22/20. (GRE)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/22/20. (GRE)
July 22, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by 84 Lumber Company. (Pratt, P)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership. (Pratt, P)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bledsoe County Circuit, case number 5796. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4420773), filed by 84 Lumber Company, 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Pratt, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 84 Lumber Company
Represented By: Nicholas Warren Diegel
Represented By: P Edward Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: 84 Lumber Company, a Limited Partnership
Represented By: Nicholas Warren Diegel
Represented By: P Edward Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Duncan
Represented By: James Paul McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: U.S. Lumber Group, LLC
Represented By: Mary Ann Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?