Sream, Inc v. Pooja, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc
Defendant: Pooja, Inc. and Pooja, Inc. doing business as Kankus Express
Case Number: 1:2020cv00210
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Pooja, Inc. (CNC)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by Sream, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be issued)(Long, Casey)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Casey Adam Long on behalf of Plaintiff Sream, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 08/06/2020. (KRS) Modified on 8/7/2020 Serviced to Casey Long via email and mail.(AWS)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long.
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long.
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long.
August 6, 2020 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court concludes these cases are related to previously filed case No. 1:20-cv-209-DCLC-SKL, styled Sream, Inc., v. Kanku Express #21. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign these cases to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long.
July 30, 2020 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Pooja, Inc. (AML)
July 30, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sream, Inc (AML)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Casey Long by Sream, Inc. (Admission Application Pending) (AML)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pooja, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 paid, Receipt C1017723) filed by Sream, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Case Filing Fee Receipt) #3 Exhibit to Complaint) (AML).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc v. Pooja, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pooja, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pooja, Inc. doing business as Kankus Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc
Represented By: Casey Adam Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?