Kenco Transportation Management, LLC v. Nina Transport, Inc. (PLR3)
Plaintiff: Kenco Transportation Management, LLC
Defendant: Nina Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00222
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Pamela L Reeves no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to District Judge Travis R McDonough for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/22/2020. (BDG)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Kenco Transportation Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kenco Group, Inc. for Kenco Transportation Management, LLC. (Elliott, John)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/12/20. (GRE)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/12/20. (GRE)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/12/20. (GRE)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint: requirements due by 8/17/2020. (GRE)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nina Transport, Inc. (GRE)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT AMENDED SUMMONS by Kenco Transportation Management, LLC. (Elliott, John)
August 12, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (GRE)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nina Transport, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4442995.), filed by Kenco Transportation Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Other Corporate Disclosure, #7 Summons Summons)(Elliott, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenco Transportation Management, LLC v. Nina Transport, Inc. (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenco Transportation Management, LLC
Represented By: John Y Elliott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?