Clevenger v. Centurion et al
Plaintiff: Scott Clevenger
Defendant: Tony Parker, John Doe, Centurion and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00230
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: R Leon Jordan
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
2 Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Centurion. (AWS)Serviced Summons, Order and Complaint to USMS.
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiffs inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set forth. Plaintiff's claim that Centurion and John/Jane Doe have denied him adequate medical care shall PROCEED.Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the service packet and return it to the Clerk's Office within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this memorandum and order. Defendant Tony Parker is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge R. Leon Jordan on 9/28/20. (c/m Scott Clevenger 399651 BLEDSOE COUNTY CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX Site 2, Unit 9 1045 Horsehead Road PIKEVILLE, TN 37367 with service packet and custodian of inmate accounts, and Attorney General for the State of Tennessee)(ADA)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Pamela L Reeves no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to District Judge R Leon Jordan for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/22/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Scott Clevenger.
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (AML) Mailed to Scott Clevenger
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Centurion, Jane Doe, John Doe, Tony Parker, filed by Scott Clevenger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Envelope)(AML)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scott Clevenger. (AML)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clevenger v. Centurion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?