Wood v. SSA (TV2)
Plaintiff: Michaeljames Taylor Wood
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00323
Filed: November 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to US Attorney for EDTN, #2 Summons Issued as to US Attorney General)(AML)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Either Plaintiff or the US Marshal is hereby DIRECTED to serve the summons and complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11/25/2020. (AML)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Michaeljames Taylor Wood Civil Cover Sheet and Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons SSA Regional Counsel, #2 Summons US Attny EDTN, #3 Summons US Attny General)(Murphy, Peter)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint - SSA : requirements due by 11/30/2020. (DJH)
November 21, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (DJH)
November 21, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michaeljames Taylor Wood. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IFP adult supported by parents)(Murphy, Peter)
November 21, 2020 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Michaeljames Taylor Wood.(Murphy, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. SSA (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaeljames Taylor Wood
Represented By: Peter B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?