Roundtree v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Danielle P. Roundtree
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00326
Filed: November 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 1/19/2021, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 1/21/2021, and United States Attorney General on 1/19/2021, filed by Danielle P. Roundtree. (Palmer, Melissa)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (BJL)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for good cause shown. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue to necessary service packet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 1-7-21. This entry constitutes the Order of the Court. (KMG)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. This entry is the complete Order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger on December 1, 2020. (KLW)
November 30, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4570135.) filed by Danielle P. Roundtree (JCK)
November 30, 2020 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
November 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4570135.) by Danielle P. Roundtree. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
November 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danielle P. Roundtree. (Palmer, Melissa)
November 29, 2020 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, filed by Danielle P. Roundtree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roundtree v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle P. Roundtree
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?