Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated v. Steam Logistics, LLC (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated
Defendant: Steam Logistics, LLC and Steam Ocean
Case Number: 1:2020cv00337
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Steam Logistics, LLC. (Barham, Stephen)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated by Steam Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Credit Application, #2 Exhibit B - Terms & Conditions, #3 Exhibit C - Waybill, #4 Exhibit D - Bill of Lading, #5 Exhibit E - Emergency Action Notification, #6 Exhibit F - Invoice)(Barham, Stephen)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Complaint served on Jason Provonsha, CEO on 12-2-20, filed by Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated. (Presley, Buddy)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Steam Logistics, LLC. (Barham, Stephen)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Steam Logistics, LLC. (SAC)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated REQUEST FOR CIVIL SUMMONS (Presley, Buddy)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated re #1 Complaint Civil Case Coversheet (Presley, Buddy)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated. (Presley, Buddy)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/4/2020. (JCK)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/4/2020. (JCK)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/4/2020. (JCK)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Complaint. Address information should not have been entered. Also, please file a completed civil cover sheet Requirements due by 12/9/2020. (JCK)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Steam Logistics, LLC.. (JCK)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steam Logistics, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4576847.), filed by Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice and House Bill of Lading)(Presley, Buddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated v. Steam Logistics, LLC (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Lifiting Services, Incorporated
Represented By: Buddy B Presley, Jr
Represented By: Terrance Lloyd Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steam Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Stephen D Barham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steam Ocean
Represented By: Stephen D Barham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?