Beasley v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Robert Beasley
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00009
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal Case Robert Beasley v. Norfolk Southern by Robert Beasley. (Anderson, Claude)
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #15 Stipulation Corrected Notice and Joint Stipulation by Robert Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Proposed Order)(Stone, Jonathan)
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #14 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac), #11 Proposed Pretrial Order Notice & Joint Stipulation by Robert Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Proposed Order)(Stone, Jonathan)
March 1, 2021 Filing 14 Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Proposed Pretrial Order : requirements due by 3/8/2021. (DJH)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 2-9-21. (KMG)
February 8, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4646180.) filed by Robert Beasley as to Robert Beasley (DJH)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4646180.) by Robert Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Other USDC EDVa Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Other VA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Other WVA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Stone, Jonathan)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER AGREED ORDER by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Allen, Craig)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R Allen on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Allen, Craig)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Due to delays caused by the COVID-19 pandemic in obtaining a certificate of good standing from the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Virginia, the Court hereby EXTENDS Attorney Jonathan L. Stone's deadline to file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice to February 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 1-28-21. This entry constitutes the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (CNC)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mr. Stone's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Robert Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Deficiency)(Anderson, Claude)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons to Norfolk Southern by Robert Beasley. (Anderson, Claude)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Jonathan L. Stone is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (CAT)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/19/2021. (CAT)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/19/2021. (CAT)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/19/2021. (CAT)
January 19, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CAT)
January 19, 2021 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (CAT)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Robert Beasley against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4625399.), filed by Robert Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Claude)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Craig R Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Beasley
Represented By: Claude W. Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?