Hays v. Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC
Plaintiff: James Hays
Defendant: Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00037
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hamill, Douglas)
April 28, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Strike Jury Demand MOTION to Strike filed by James Hays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hays Declaration)(Hamill, Douglas)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by James Hays (Hamill, Douglas)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Strike Jury Demand by Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC. (Litchford, Mark). Added MOTION to Strike on 4/27/2021 (SAC).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer up to and including April 26, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4-16-21. This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG) Modified on 4/19/2021. Serviced via US Mail to attorney Daniel Austin. (KFB).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4-16-21. (KMG)
April 16, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel G. Austin ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4712524.) filed by Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC (GRE)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel G. Austin ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4712524.) by Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Litchford, Mark)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC. (Litchford, Mark)
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC. (Litchford, Mark)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on March 25, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Litchford on behalf of Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC (Litchford, Mark)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hays. Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC served on 3/4/2021. (Hamill, Douglas)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 03/02/2021. (CAT)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 03/02/2021. (CAT)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 03/02/2021. (CAT)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC. (CAT)
March 2, 2021 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CAT)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4670755.), filed by James Hays. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Hamill, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays v. Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hays
Represented By: Douglas S Hamill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Tank Wash, LLC
Represented By: Daniel G. Austin
Represented By: Mark Litchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?