Hill v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company (TV1)
Plaintiff: Adam L Hill
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00071
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4-28-21. (KMG) Attorney Stone sent notification to finalize registration (AML).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO PRODUCE HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL RECORDS. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/28/21. (ABF)
April 28, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Adam L Hill. (AWS)
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Produce Hospital and Medical Records by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amy Stone ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4720479.) by Adam L Hill. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate Good Standing, #2 Other proposed order)(Anderson, Claude) Modified on 4/27/2021 (BJL).
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Adam L Hill (Anderson, Claude)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/14/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/21/21. (ABF)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baker, John)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Baker, John)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Haley Neubert c/o CT Corporation System, Inc. on 04/008/2021, filed by Adam L Hill. (Anderson, Claude)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Baker, John)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Baker, John)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/6/21. (JBR)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/6/21. (JBR)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/6/21. (JBR)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (JBR)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4703142.), filed by Adam Hill. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Anderson, Claude)
April 6, 2021 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam L Hill
Represented By: Claude W. Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Amy L. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?