Malone v. Angle et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Chris Malone
Defendant: Steven Angle, Rusty Wright and Mark Wharton
Case Number: 1:2021cv00089
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION by Chris Malone. (Churdar, Douglas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE by Chris Malone (Churdar, Douglas)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 8/16/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A. Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A. Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 6/23/21. (ADA)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ Non-Consent) (BDG)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Steven Angle(in his official capacity as Chancellor at the University of Tennessee-Chattanooga), Steven Angle(in his individual capacity), Mark Wharton(in his individual capacity), Mark Wharton(in his official capacity as Vice-Chancellor and Athletic Director at the University of Tennessee-Chattanooga), Rusty Wright(in his individual capacity), Rusty Wright(in his official capacity as Head Football Coach at the University of Tennessee-Chattanooga).(Fitzgerald, Michael)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rusty Wright on May 5, 2021, filed by Chris Malone. (Churdar, Douglas)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mark Wharton on May 5, 2021, filed by Chris Malone. (Churdar, Douglas)
May 5, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Steven Angle on May 5, 2021, filed by Chris Malone. (Churdar, Douglas)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Wharton, #2 Summons Wright)(SAC)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas A. Churder on behalf of Plaintiff Chris Malone. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/28/2021. (KRS) Modified on 4/29/2021, regenerated event and mailed to Attorney Churder . (SAC).
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint - Summons for Wright by Chris Malone. (Duggins, Stephen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint - Summons for Wharton by Chris Malone. (Duggins, Stephen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint -summons for S. Angle by Chris Malone. (Duggins, Stephen)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 04/27/2021. (Copy of Order mailed to Douglas A Churdar) (AMP)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 04/27/2021. (Copy of Order mailed to Douglas A Churdar) (AMP)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 04/27/2021. (AMP) Modified on 4/27/2021 to reflect copy of Order mailed to Douglas A Churdar (AMP).
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Per Local Rule 4.1, any attorney filing a complaint shall prepare and submit the summons using Form AO 440. Please refile the Summons using the event Supplement under Other Documents and linking it to the Complaint. Also, for future reference, address information should not be entered and the civil cover sheet should be filed in a non-fillable form. Requirements due by 5/3/2021. (AMP)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Chris Malone. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Angle, #3 Summons Summons for Wharton, #4 Summons Summons for Wright)(Duggins, Stephen)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4721819.) by Chris Malone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Duggins, Stephen)
April 27, 2021 Filing fee paid, Receipt Number ATNEDC-4721806$ 402.00 pd, attorney will refile documents, system error. (SAC)
April 27, 2021 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
April 27, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #1 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4721819.) filed by Chris Malone . (AMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. Angle et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Angle
Represented By: Michael D Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Wright
Represented By: Michael D Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wharton
Represented By: Michael D Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Malone
Represented By: Stephen S Duggins
Represented By: Douglas A Churdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?