Pinckney v. Champion et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pinckney and Jennifer Pinckney doing business as Eternal Photo Moments
Defendant: Tainted Lyric LLC, steven champion and Daphne McCool
Case Number: 1:2021cv00094
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall file the discovery plan on or before July 6, 2021.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on June 30, 2021. (SAC)
June 29, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan Report by Jennifer Pinckney. (Christopher, Kevin)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2021 02:00 PM (by telephone) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr..Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 6/15/21. (CNC)
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 Defendants Steven Champion, Tainted Lyric, LLC and Daphne Mitchell McCool on Behalf of 180 Talent Group's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, of Plaintiff Jennifer Pinckney d/b/a Eternal Photo Moments by Steven Champion, Daphne McCool.(Davis, Andrew)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 6-7-21. (KMG)
June 7, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4753210.) filed by Daphne McCool (CNC)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4753210.) by Daphne McCool. (Layne, Roger)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to Register of Copyrights by Jennifer Pinckney re #1 Complaint,,,, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal regarding a Copyright (Christopher, Kevin) Modified on 5/7/2021, to update docket text. (SAC).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 5/5/21. (GRE)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 5/5/21. (GRE)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 5/5/21. (GRE)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (GRE)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Complaint: requirements due by 5/10/2021. (GRE)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,,,, Summons to Daphne McCool by Jennifer Pinckney. (Christopher, Kevin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,,,, Summons to Steven Champion by Jennifer Pinckney. (Christopher, Kevin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,,,, Summons to Tainted Lyric, LLC by Jennifer Pinckney. (Christopher, Kevin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,,,, Civil Case Cover Sheet by Jennifer Pinckney. (Christopher, Kevin)
May 5, 2021 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (GRE)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Pinckney ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4728226.), filed by Jennifer Pinckney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Copyrighted Promo Pic, #2 Exhibit 2 Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 Knight Photo Access, #4 Exhibit 4 First Promo Pic Post, #5 Exhibit 5 Photo Expenses to Knight, #6 Exhibit 6 Champion Facebook Page, #7 Exhibit 7 Promo Pic Usage, #8 Exhibit 8 Website Sale Image, #9 Exhibit 9 Champion Facebook Post, #10 Exhibit 10 Champion Facebook Post, #11 Exhibit 11 Facebook Event, #12 Exhibit 12 Facebook Event, #13 Exhibit 13 BamaSlam Event, #14 Exhibit 14 Skyline Event, #15 Exhibit 15 Facebook Event, #16 Exhibit 16 Facebook Event, #17 Exhibit 17 Facebook Post, #18 Exhibit 18 Instagram Post, #19 Exhibit 19 LinkTree Site, #20 Exhibit 20 Mobil Website, #21 Exhibit 21 Patreon Page, #22 Exhibit 22 Twitch Account, #23 Exhibit 23 Photo of Fame, #24 Exhibit 24 Instagram Increase, #25 Exhibit 25 Instagram Profile, #26 Exhibit 26 Facebook Profile, #27 Exhibit 27 Demand Letter, #28 Exhibit 28 Demand Ignored, #29 Exhibit 29 Cease and Desist)(Christopher, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinckney v. Champion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tainted Lyric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: steven champion
Represented By: Andrew Peters Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne McCool
Represented By: Glen Chad Moore
Represented By: Andrew Peters Davis
Represented By: Roger Dereck Layne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pinckney
Represented By: Kevin Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pinckney doing business as Eternal Photo Moments
Represented By: Kevin Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?