Smith v. Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C.
Plaintiff: Staci Smith
Defendant: Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00163
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held on 9/8/2021, without a Court Reporter or Courtroom Deputy. (BJL)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/14/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2022 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/8/2021. (BDG)
September 7, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C.., filed by Staci Smith.(Hamill, Douglas)
September 7, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED and Plaintiff is ORDERED to file her Amended Complaint within seven days of the entry of this Order. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Revise #1 Complaint, by Staci Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Hamill, Douglas)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Staci Smith (Hamill, Douglas)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (BDG)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C. identifying Corporate Parent Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C. for Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C.. (Gray, Russell)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C..(Gray, Russell)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference previously set for 9/1/2021 at 1:00 PM is hereby RESET for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Dial-in instructions will be circulated via email. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 9/1/2021. (BKS)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hamill, Douglas)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2021 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 8/10/2021. (KTC)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond by Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C.. (Gray, Russell)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Staci Smith. Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C. served on 7/21/2021. (Hamill, Douglas)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C. (AML)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/20/2021. (AML)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/20/2021. (AML)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/20/2021. (AML)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4792552.), filed by Staci Smith. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C.)(Hamill, Douglas)
July 20, 2021 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AML)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Smith
Represented By: Douglas S Hamill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Orthopaedic Group, P.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Lane Crowder
Represented By: Russell W Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?