Eller v. Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Katherine Eller
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00164
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General; U.S. Attorney; and SSA Office of Regional Counsel on 07/26/2021, filed by Katherine Eller. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Jackson, Forrest)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE re IFP Service (Attorney Representation) (CNC)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, SSA Office of General Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (CNC)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for good cause shown. The Clerk shall issue to Plaintiff the appropriate service packet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-21-21. This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG)
July 20, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CNC)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Katherine Eller. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(Jackson, Forrest)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA, filed by Katherine Eller. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons #1, #3 Summons #2, #4 Summons #3, #5 Supplement Assignment of EAJA Fees)(Jackson, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eller v. Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Eller
Represented By: Forrest Earl Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?