American College of Pediatricians et al v. Becerra et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: American College of Pediatricians, Catholic Medical Association, Jeanie Dassow and Jeanie Dassow, M.D.
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Robinsue Frohboese and Office for Civil Rights of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv00195
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julie Marie Blake on behalf of Plaintiffs American College of Pediatricians, Catholic Medical Association, Jeanie Dassow, MD. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 09/14/2021. (KRS) Modified on 9/15/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Julie Marie Blake
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan L. Bangert on behalf of Plaintiffs American College of Pediatricians, Catholic Medical Association, Jeanie Dassow, MD. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 09/14/2021. (KRS) Modified on 9/15/2021 (BJL). Mailed to Attorney Ryan L. Bangert.
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Katherine A Crytzer no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Thomas A Varlan for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/14/2021. (BJL) Modified on 9/14/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorneys Julie M. Blake and Ryan L Bangert.
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 9/13/21. (ABF) Modified on 9/14/2021 (BJL). Copy sent via email to Chief Judge McDonough's Chambers.
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julie M Blake (Filing fee $ 90.00, Receipt NO C1818571) by American College of Pediatricians, Catholic Medical Association, Jeanie Dassow, MD. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(BJL) Modified on 9/8/2021 (BJL).
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan L. Bangert (Filing fee $ 90.00, Receipt No. C1818571) by American College of Pediatricians, Catholic Medical Association, Jeanie Dassow, MD. (BJL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2021: #1 Other Receipt) (BJL).
September 8, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by American College of Pediatricians, Catholic Medical Association, Jeanie Dassow, M.D., #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by American College of Pediatricians, Catholic Medical Association, Jeanie Dassow, M.D. (BJL)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 8/31/2021. (BJL)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 8/31/2021. (BJL)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 8/31/2021. (BJL)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (BJL)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL)*Mailed to Attorneys Julie Blake, Anthony Biller and Ryan Bangert
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by American College of Pediatricians. (BJL) Modified on 9/1/2021 (BJL).
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Catholic Medical Association. (BJL)
August 26, 2021 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4826494.), filed by American College of Pediatricians, Jeanie Dassow, Catholic Medical Association. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Xavier Becerra, #3 Summons for United States Department of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons for Robinsue Frohboese, #5 Summons for Office for Civil Rights of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #6 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement of American College of Pediatricians, #7 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement of Catholic Medical Association)(Scruggs, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American College of Pediatricians et al v. Becerra et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American College of Pediatricians
Represented By: Jonathan Scruggs
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Represented By: Julie M Blake
Represented By: Ryan L Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Medical Association
Represented By: Jonathan Scruggs
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Represented By: Julie M Blake
Represented By: Ryan L Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Dassow
Represented By: Jonathan Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Dassow, M.D.
Represented By: Anthony J Biller
Represented By: Julie M Blake
Represented By: Ryan L Bangert
Represented By: Jonathan Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinsue Frohboese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office for Civil Rights of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?