UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, v. Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, Etc., and Camerino Lopez, Lopez, et al. (TV2)
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,
Defendant: Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, Etc., and Camerino Lopez, Lopez, et al., Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, Etc., Camerino Lopez Lopez, Christina Lopez, JP Morgan Chase & Co. and Preferred Title Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00257
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 945 a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of December 10, 2021 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Defendant Camerino Lopez Lopez, #2 Certificate of Service for Defendant Christina Lopez, #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested (PS Form 3811) for Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co., #4 Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested (PS Form 3811) for Defendant Preferred Title Insurance Agency, Inc.)(Chase, James)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF POSSESSION. Defendants are ORDERED to immediately comply with this Order and to surrender possession of said property to the TVA pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 12/8/21. (ADA)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Possession filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,. (Chase, James)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Possession by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
November 18, 2021 Payment received for the Court's Registry of $500, receipt number C1018718. (SAC)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Deposit Funds. The Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to accept a check for Five Hundred Dollars ($500), to be deposited pursuant to the Declaration of Taking [Doc. 1-3] and any future funds to be deposited in accordance with Local Rule 67.1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all funds received shall be deposited in the Court Registry Investment System (CRIS) administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2045, Local Rule 67.1(b), and Administrative Order No. 2017-20. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/16/21. (JBR)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chase, James)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Investment Order)(Chase, James)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/25/21. (KDO)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/25/21. (KDO)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/25/21. (KDO)
October 25, 2021 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (KDO)
October 25, 2021 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (KDO)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,. (Attachments: #1 Property Description, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration of Taking, #4 Property Description, #5 Map, #6 Notice of Condemnation, #7 Property Description)(Chase, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, v. Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, Etc., and Camerino Lopez, Lopez, et al. (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, Etc., and Camerino Lopez, Lopez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree-Removal Rights with Respect to Land in Rhea County, Tennessee, Etc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camerino Lopez Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Title Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?