Neo Wireless, LLC v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: Neo Wireless, LLC
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc, Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations, LLC and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00076
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. For good cause shown and without objection, Defendants shall have until June 20, 2022, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
April 19, 2022 Filing 16 UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION. (SAC)
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Levy, Ryan)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D Levy on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Levy, Ryan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Neo Wireless, LLC Regarding MDL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Filing)(Lenihan, Mark)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason D. Cassady on behalf of Plaintiff Neo Wireless, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/12/2022. (KRS)
April 12, 2022 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason D. Cassady ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5030460.) filed by Neo Wireless, LLC as to Neo Wireless, LLC (SAC)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason D. Cassady ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5030460.) by Neo Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lenihan, Mark)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neo Wireless, LLC. Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations, LLC served on 3/31/2022. (Lenihan, Mark)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neo Wireless, LLC. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 3/31/2022. (Lenihan, Mark)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Neo Wireless, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CFIP NCF Holdings LLC for Neo Wireless, LLC. (Lenihan, Mark)
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac Attorney Jason D. Cassady) Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a Magistrate Judge ifa pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of notice mailed to Jason D. Cassady.) (KSH)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/30/22. (Copy of order mailed to Jason D. Cassady.) (KSH)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/30/22. (Copy of order mailed to Jason D. Cassady.) (KSH)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/30/22. (KSH) Modified on 3/30/2022 (Copy of order mailed to Jason D. Cassady.) (KSH).
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga)(KSH)
March 30, 2022 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (KSH)
March 30, 2022 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Neo Wireless, LLC. (KSH)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 8,467,366; 10,075,941; 10,447,450; 10,771,302; 10,833,908; 10,965,512 . (Lenihan, Mark)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5018998.), filed by Neo Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. 8,467,366, #2 Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 10,833,908, #3 Exhibit 3 - Patent No. 10,075,94, #4 Exhibit 4 - Patent No. 10,447,450, #5 Exhibit 5 - Patent No. 10,965,512, #6 Exhibit 6 - Patent No. 10,771,302, #7 Exhibit 7 - Claim 1 of 8,467,366, #8 Exhibit 8 - Claim 11 of 10,833,908, #9 Exhibit 9 - Claim 13 of 10,075,941, #10 Exhibit 10 - Claim 7 of 10,447,450, #11 Exhibit 11 - Claim 15 of 10,965,512, #12 Exhibit 12 - Claim 23 of 10,771,302, #13 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons Volkswagen Group of America, #15 Summons Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations)(Lenihan, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neo Wireless, LLC v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neo Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Mark W Lenihan
Represented By: Evan Stephen Rothey
Represented By: Jason D. Cassady
Represented By: Samuel P Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations, LLC
Represented By: Ryan D Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Kilgore
Represented By: Ryan D Levy
Represented By: Seth Rayborn Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?