Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America v. White et al
Plaintiff: Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Christy Lynn White, Christy Lynn Casteel, James Walker and Beverly Walker
Case Number: 1:2022cv00143
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America (Burke, Emily)
July 26, 2022 Case closed pursuant to #12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America. (BJL)
July 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America of Settlement (Burke, Emily)
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued as to Christy Lynn White. (BJL)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America. (Burke, Emily)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BJL)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Burke, Emily)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America. (Burke, Emily)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/3/2022. (AML)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/3/2022. (AML)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/3/2022. (AML)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) re #1 Complaint. Civil Case Cover Sheet was not flattened before being filed on ECF. (AML)
June 3, 2022 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America. (AML)
June 3, 2022 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AML)
June 3, 2022 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Beverly Walker, James Walker, Christy Lynn White. (AML)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -In-Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5077061.), filed by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Emily C. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Lynn White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Lynn Casteel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?