Careathers v. Booth et al
Plaintiff: Grady J Careathers
Defendant: Officer Booth and Officer Carson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00146
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM & ORDER. It appears from the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and supporting documents #6 that Plaintiff lacks sufficient financial resources to pay the filing fee. Accordingly, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, this motion #1 is GRANTED. Because Plaintiff is an inmate in the Hamilton County Detention Center, he is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit payments as set forth. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the service packets and return them to the Clerk's Office within twenty days of receipt of this Order. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 8/2/22. (c/m Grady J Careathers 127772 SILVERDALE HAMILTON COUNTY DETENTION CENTER P O BOX 23148 CHATTANOOGA, TN 37422 with service packet and Sheriff of Hamilton County)(ADA)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT statement by Plaintiff Grady J Careathers (ADA)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Plaintiff Careathers called to notify us he just received account statement papers and will be sending in the Certified Account Statement page. (SAC)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 6/24/22. (c/m Grady J Careathers 127772 SILVERDALE HAMILTON COUNTY DETENTION CENTER P O BOX 23148 CHATTANOOGA, TN 37422 with account form) (ADA)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT (page 5) to #2 Complaint by Grady J Careathers. (ADA)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (SAC)Notice served by mail this day to Grady J Careathers127772SILVERDALEHAMILTON COUNTY DETENTION CENTERP O BOX 23148CHATTANOOGA, TN 37422
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Officer Booth, Officer Carson, filed by Grady J Careathers.(SAC)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Grady J Careathers. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Careathers v. Booth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady J Careathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?