Goodwin v. Hammond et al
Plaintiff: Edgar Goodwin
Defendant: Jim Hammond, Director Shian, Nurse Rowe, Hamilton Co Medical Staff, Grievance Staff, Nurse Watkins, C/o Bell, C/o Cox and Nurse Linda
Case Number: 1:2023cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiff has filed motions seeking (1) the appointment of counsel #6 , (2) to compel discovery #7 , (3) records #8 , and (4) a list of all motions that may be filed in civil cases #9 . For the reasons articulated below, all of Plaintiffs motions are without merit and will be DENIED. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 2/21/23.Edgar Goodwin #17052 SILVERDALE DETENTION CENTER 7609 STANDIFER GAP ROAD CHATTANOOGA, TN 37421) (ADA)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Edgar Goodwin re service packets. (remailed service packet forms) (ADA)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF "Motion" requesting progress of the case by Edgar Goodwin (mailed docket sheet) (ADA)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION requesting knowledge of the different motions in civil court by Edgar Goodwin. (ADA)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Records by Edgar Goodwin. (ADA)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Edgar Goodwin. (ADA)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION requesting Appointment of Counsel by Edgar Goodwin. (ADA)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE confirming address at Hamilton County Jail by Edgar Goodwin (ADA)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiffs inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set forth. Plaintiff has set forth a plausible claim of inadequate medical care against Defendants Hammond, Watkins, Rowe, Linda, Shian, and unknown Hamilton County Medical Staff. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the service packets and return them to the Clerks Office within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this Order. All other claims and Defendants are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 1/17/23. (c/m Edgar Goodwin #17052 SILVERDALE HAMILTON COUNTY 7609 STANDIFER GAP ROAD PO BOX 23148 CHATTANOOGA, TN 37422-3148 with service packets and custodian of inmate accounts)(ADA)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (AWS) Mailed to Edgar Goodwin.
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edgar Goodwin. (AWS)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edgar Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Hammond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Shian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Co Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grievance Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/o Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/o Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Linda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?