Vincent Systems GMBH v. Fillauer Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vincent Systems GMBH
Defendant: Fillauer Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Vincent Systems GMBH REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT (Seraphine, Jennifer)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer Seraphine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vincent Systems GMBH. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/05/2023. (KRS) Mailed and Emailed to Attorney Seraphine on 1/6/2023 (AML).
January 4, 2023 Filing 8 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: Copyright/Patent Form not filed with #1 Complaint : requirements due by 1/9/2023. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Seraphine
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 1/4/2023. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Seraphine
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 1/4/2023. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Seraphine
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 1/4/2023. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Seraphine
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fillauer Companies, Inc. (AML)
January 4, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Vincent Systems GMBH. (AML)
January 4, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Jennifer Seraphine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt attached) by Vincent Systems GMBH. (AML)
January 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fillauer Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 paid, receipt attached), filed by Vincent Systems GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet)(AML)
January 4, 2023 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Jennifer Seraphine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid) filed by Vincent Systems GMBH (AML)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent Systems GMBH v. Fillauer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Systems GMBH
Represented By: Jennifer Seraphine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fillauer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?