Taylor v. The TJX Companies, Inc. (TV1)
Plaintiff: Lisa Michele Taylor
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc. doing business as Marshalls
Case Number: 1:2023cv00208
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 INFORMATIONAL Administrative Notice to Counsel #10 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent : (KFB)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by The TJX Companies, Inc. (Henry, Alaric)
November 1, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior Court Order. (SAC)
September 18, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Citizenship by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Business Entity Citizenship)(Henry, Alaric)
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The TJX Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The TJX Companies, Inc. d/b/a Marshalls for The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Business Entity Disclosure)(Henry, Alaric)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 09/15/2023. (CAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2023: #1 Other Notice of Consent/ NonConsent) (CAT).
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal : Please file a Civil Cover Sheet using the event Supplement found under OtherDocuments and link it back to the Notice of Removal. Requirements due by 9/20/2023. (CAT)
September 15, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by The TJX Companies, Inc. (CAT)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 09/15/2023. (CAT)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 09/15/2023. (CAT)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 09/15/2023. (CAT)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 23-C-818. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5471800), filed by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Other Civil Case Coversheet)(Henry, Alaric)
September 15, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by The TJX Companies, Inc. (CAT)
September 15, 2023 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT)
September 15, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by The TJX Companies, Inc. (CAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. The TJX Companies, Inc. (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Michele Taylor
Represented By: Jonathan L Griffith
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc. doing business as Marshalls
Represented By: Alaric A Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?