Salmons v. Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC
Plaintiff: Virgil Salmons
Defendant: Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00211
Filed: September 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 3/4/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2025 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 11/3/2023. (AML)
October 26, 2023 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, R)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2023 02:00 PM (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 10/13/2023. (AML)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Gestamp North America, Inc. for Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC. (Mack, Emily)
October 11, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC.(Mack, Emily)
September 25, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virgil Salmons. Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC served on 9/20/2023. (McCown, John)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 9/18/23. (JBR)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 9/18/23. (JBR)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 9/18/23. (JBR)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC. (JBR)
September 18, 2023 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JBR)
September 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Virgil Salmons against Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5472564.), filed by Virgil Salmons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(McCown, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salmons v. Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Salmons
Represented By: R Scott Jackson, Jr
Represented By: John Robert McCown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gestamp Chattanooga, LLC
Represented By: Emily Harper Mack
Represented By: Savannah McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?