Toomey v. O'Keefe
Plaintiff: Tia-Clair Toomey
Defendant: Matt O'Keefe
Case Number: 1:2024cv00018
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant's Reply shall be filed on or before 3/20/2024. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 3/12/2024. (GMS)
March 11, 2024 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Matt O'Keefe. (Shaw, Scott)
March 11, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion by Matt O'Keefe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, Scott)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Tia-Clair Toomey. (Berke, Ronald)
March 6, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Tia-Clair Toomey. (Berke, Ronald)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [Doc. 7] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file their Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 6] on or before March 8, 2024. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 2/1/2024. (GMS)
January 31, 2024 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Tia-Clair Toomey. (Berke, Ronald)
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Tia-Clair Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berke, Ronald)
January 26, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) by Matt O'Keefe. (Attachments: #1 Other Sworn Declaration with Exhibits)(Shaw, Scott)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Citizenship by Matt O'Keefe. (Shaw, Scott)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/22/2024. (LCK)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/22/2024. (LCK)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/22/2024. (LCK)
January 22, 2024 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Matt O'Keefe. (LCK)
January 19, 2024 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (LCK)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chancery Ct Hamilton County, TN, case number 23-0796. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5571590), filed by Matt O'Keefe.(Shaw, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toomey v. O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia-Clair Toomey
Represented By: Ronald J Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt O'Keefe
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?