United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. An Easement and Right-of-Way, Etc., More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee, and et al
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: Harmon L. Hale, Ann B. Hale and An Easement and Right-of-Way, Etc., More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee, and
Case Number: 1:2024cv00383
Filed: December 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Michael J Dumitru
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. § 945 Compensation for Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/16/2025. (DCB)
January 15, 2025 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
January 15, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
January 15, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
January 15, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE re #8 ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Receipt re check received today in response to #8 Order. (DCB)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/10/2025. (DCB)
January 7, 2025 Magistrate Judge Michael James Dumitru added per SO 25-03. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee no longer assigned to case. (DCB)
December 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of December 12, 2024 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service - Harmon L. Hale, #2 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service - Ann B. Hale)(Chase, James)
December 16, 2024 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chase, James)
December 16, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds by An Easement and Right-of-Way, Etc., More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee, and. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(Chase, James)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/12/2024. (DCB)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/12/2024. (DCB)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/12/2024. (DCB)
December 12, 2024 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (DCB)
December 12, 2024 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (DCB)
December 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Property Description, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration of Taking, #4 Property Description, #5 Map, #6 Notice of Condemnation, #7 Property Description)(Chase, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. An Easement and Right-of-Way, Etc., More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee, and et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon L. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann B. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way, Etc., More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee, and
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?