United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. Easements and Rights-of-Way Over 5.28 Acres of Land, More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: Harmon Lee Hale, Easements and Rights-of-Way Over 5.28 Acres of Land, More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee and Harmon L. Hale
Case Number: 1:2024cv00388
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Michael J Dumitru
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. § 945 a Complaint in Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2025 United States Magistrate Judge Mike Dumitru added per SO 25-03. Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee is no longer assigned to this case. (ABF)
January 2, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of December 17, 2024 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service)(Chase, James)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF POSSESSION. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 12/18/24. (ABF)
December 18, 2024 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION for entry of an Order of Immediate Possession Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
December 18, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for entry of an Order of Immediate Possession Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
December 17, 2024 Payment received in the amount of $47,700 deposited to Court's registry, receipt no. 100001454. (SAC)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 12/13/2024. (MKM)
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
December 13, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(Chase, James)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 12/13/2024. (MKM)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 12/13/2024. (MKM)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 12/13/2024. (MKM)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Property Description, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration of Taking, #4 Property Description, #5 Maps, #6 Notice of Condemnation, #7 Property Description)(Chase, James)
December 13, 2024 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (MKM)
December 13, 2024 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (MKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. Easements and Rights-of-Way Over 5.28 Acres of Land, More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon Lee Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easements and Rights-of-Way Over 5.28 Acres of Land, More or Less in Sequatchie County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon L. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?