Celaya et al v. Drive, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eliazar Hernandez Celaya and Jocabed Camacho Gonzalez
Defendant: Drive, LLC and Shawn Steven Levings
Case Number: 1:2025cv00030
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Michael J Dumitru
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE by Drive, LLC, Shawn Steven Levings of Substitution of Counsel (Lavelle, Ethan)
March 6, 2025 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown and because the motion was jointly filed by all parties, Defendants shall have an extension until April 14, 2025, in which to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Mike Dumitru. (RFH)
March 4, 2025 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Drive, LLC, Shawn Steven Levings. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed order)(Wolfe, Joshua)
February 6, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Shawn Steven Levings. (Uhorchuk, Robert) Modified to reflect motion termed per Law Clerk on 2/7/2025 (CAT).
February 5, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A Wolfe on behalf of Shawn Steven Levings (Wolfe, Joshua)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 01/31/2025. (CAT)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 01/31/2025. (CAT)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 01/31/2025. (CAT)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Circuit Court, case number 23495. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5898790), filed by Drive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfe, Joshua)
January 31, 2025 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Michael J Dumitru added. (CAT)
January 31, 2025 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Drive, LLC. (CAT)
January 31, 2025 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Drive, LLC. (CAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celaya et al v. Drive, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliazar Hernandez Celaya
Represented By: Norris A Kessler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocabed Camacho Gonzalez
Represented By: Norris A Kessler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Steven Levings
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?