Garrett et al v. J D Specialties, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steve Garrett and Rosemary Garrett
Defendant: J D Specialties, Inc. and Vann Owens Steel, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00195
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Greeneville Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Presiding Judge: Dennis H Inman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ; Vann Owens' motion for summary judgment 64 , is GRANTED, and plaintiffs' suit against it is DISMISSED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman on 12/21/11. (KDO)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; the plaintiffs' motion 48 in regard to Taco Bell and J.D. is DENIED. Accordingly, the case against them remains DISMISSED. As to Vann Owens Steel, the motion is GRANTED. The action shall remain pending against it. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/14/10. (KDO)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ; for the reasons that follow, the motion, 45 , is GRANTED. Thus, J.D.'s motion is GRANTED, and the action is time-barred. As such, the plaintiffs' action against J.D. and Taco Bell of America, Inc., is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/18/10. (KDO)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; this products liability matter is before the Court on J.D. Specialties, Inc's ("J.D.") "Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment," 4 , and Taco Bell of America, Inc.' s (Taco Bell") "Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, " 21 . For the reasons stated in the Order, the defendants' motions are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. As a result, the only claim against these defendants which is dismissed is Count Three. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/28/10. (KDO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett et al v. J D Specialties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Garrett
Represented By: Robert P Cave, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Garrett
Represented By: Robert P Cave, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vann Owens Steel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?