Rouillier v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (JRG3)

Plaintiff: Rebecca Rouillier
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Case Number: 2:2018cv00133
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Greeneville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Rowlett, George)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (CAT)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Rebecca Rouillier (Meade, Evan)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/09/2018. (CAT)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/09/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,.(Rowlett, George)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by George A Rowlett on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (Rowlett, George)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Rouillier. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, served on 10/1/2018. (Meade, Evan)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/15/18. (aws, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/15/18. (aws, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/15/18. (aws, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aws, )
August 15, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (aws, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Summons by Rebecca Rouillier. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Meade, Evan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3743612.), filed by Rebecca Rouillier. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Summons)(Meade, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouillier v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Rouillier
Represented By: Evan M.E. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?