Gragert v. Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P. (TV1)

Plaintiff: Judy Gragert
Defendant: Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00175
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Joint Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall have an additional thirty (30) days, through and including December 15, 2018, in which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED, this 16th day of November, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/16/2018. (JCK)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Pennington, Thomas)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Thorp Pennington on behalf of Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P. (Pennington, Thomas)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judy Gragert. Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P. served on 10/23/2018. (Zwilling, Edward)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/12/2018. (BDG, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/12/2018. (BDG, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/12/2018. (BDG, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 ***INFORMATIONAL ONLY*** Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint :PDF is interactive. Please make sure that all documents are flatten. (BDG, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P.. (BDG, )
October 12, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (BDG, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3791702.), filed by Judy Gragert. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Zwilling, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gragert v. Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P. (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walters Ridge Apartments, L.P.
Represented By: Thomas Thorp Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Gragert
Represented By: Edward Ira Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?