Dougherty v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV2)
Plaintiff: Craig Steven Dougherty
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00189
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Steven Dougherty. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 11/13/2018. (Smith, Harry)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Steven Dougherty. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 11/13/2018. (Smith, Harry)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Steven Dougherty. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 11/15/2018. (Smith, Harry)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons United States Attorney, #2 Summons United States Attorney General)(JCK)
November 9, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (JCK)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT Complaint against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3814073.), filed by Craig Steven Dougherty. (Attachments: #1 Other CCS, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons General Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Smith, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougherty v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Steven Dougherty
Represented By: Harry J Smith
Represented By: Solange Adams McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?