Andon v. J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Andon
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Family Dollar Store, a Wholly owned Subsidiary of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Dedicated Contract Services, Division of J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. and Greg A. Davis
Case Number: 2:2018cv00192
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/4/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/3/2019. (AML, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Powers, K)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on December 11, 2018. (KLWa, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Family Dollar Store, a Wholly owned Subsidiary of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Powers, K)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc..(Powers, K)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Greg A. Davis.(Ward, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time by Greg A. Davis. (Ward, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M Ward on behalf of Greg A. Davis (Ward, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on November 14, 2018. (RLK)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on November 14, 2018. (RLK)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on November 14, 2018. (RLK)
November 14, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (RLK)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Family Dollar Store, a Wholly owned Subsidiary of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Family Dollar, Inc. for Family Dollar Store, a Wholly owned Subsidiary of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Powers, K)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Dedicated Contract Services, Division of J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J. B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for Dedicated Contract Services, Division of J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Powers, K)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamblen County Circuit Court, case number 18CV121. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3815358), filed by Greg A. Davis, Dedicated Contract Services, Division of J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Family Dollar Store, a Wholly owned Subsidiary of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff and state court notices, #3 Other Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Powers, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andon v. J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Represented By: Travis B Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Store, a Wholly owned Subsidiary of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Represented By: Travis B Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedicated Contract Services, Division of J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg A. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Andon
Represented By: Troy L Bowlin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?