Williamson v. Infinity Funding III, LLC et al (JRG2)

Plaintiff: Phillip Williamson
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc. and Infinity Funding III, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00196
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice as to all Defendants by Phillip Williamson (Lee, Alan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer by Infinity Funding III, LLC. (Fisher, Russell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Williamson. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Other ROS - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/16/2018. (AMP)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/16/2018. (AMP)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/16/2018. (AMP)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Infinity Funding III, LLC, and Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Wakefield & Associates, Inc.) (AMP)
November 16, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (AMP)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3818695.), filed by Phillip Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Infinity TN Corp Info, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Infinity, #4 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Infinity Funding III, LLC et al (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Funding III, LLC
Represented By: Russell Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Williamson
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?