Breeden v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Courtney L Breeden
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00210
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Clifton L Corker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice as to all Defendants by Courtney L Breeden (Lee, Alan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney L Breeden. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 12/6/2018. (Lee, Alan)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/3/18. (ABF)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/3/18. (ABF)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/3/18. (ABF)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (ABF)
November 29, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3829047.), filed by Courtney L Breeden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nov. 29, 2017 Initial Coll Ltr, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breeden v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney L Breeden
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?