Caudill v. Hamblen County Jail

Plaintiff: Gregory A Caudill
Defendant: Hamblen County Jail
Case Number: 2:2018cv00213
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Gregory Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Gregory A Caudill (Complaint packets and IFPs mailed to the two other inmates who also signed letter)(Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JCK)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Greg Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAT)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff is an inmate in the Hamblen County Jail, he is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that the Court WILL NOT consider any amendments and/or supplements to the complaint or any other kind of motion for relief until after the Court has screened the complaint pursuant to the Prisoner Reform Litigation Act. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/15/2019. (AML, ) Mailed to Gregory Caudill and Inmate Account Custodian. Emailed to court financial deputy.
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint by Gregory A Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Gregory Caudill) (AMP)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Hamblen County Jail (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Gregory A Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory A Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Envelope) (AMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudill v. Hamblen County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamblen County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A Caudill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?