Brimm v. Furniture Row USA, LLC (PLR2)

Plaintiff: Edna Yvonne Brimm
Defendant: FURNITURE ROW USA, LLC, Furniture Row and Furniture Row Companies
Case Number: 2:2018cv00214
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3880142.) by Furniture Row USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Martin, Sean)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Second NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorney Adrian Collins is not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Adrian Collins)(JCK)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/7/2018. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorney Adrian Collins.
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/7/2018. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorney Adrian Collins.
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/7/2018. (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney Adrian Collins.
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney Adrian Collins.
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Informational Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal. (KFB, )
December 6, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (KFB, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by FURNITURE ROW USA, LLC. (Martin, Sean)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Washington County, case number 90CC1-2018-CV-38380. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3833562), filed by FURNITURE ROW USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Criminal Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brimm v. Furniture Row USA, LLC (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Yvonne Brimm
Represented By: Adrian Collins
Represented By: Gregory J Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FURNITURE ROW USA, LLC
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Derek Wayne Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furniture Row
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Derek Wayne Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furniture Row Companies
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Derek Wayne Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?