Breeden v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (PLR2)

Plaintiff: Courtney L Breeden
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00217
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Grisham, Arthur)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: the trial of this case will be held before the undersigned United States District Judge, with a jury, beginning on TUESDAY, JUNE 23, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Knoxville, Tennessee in Courtroom 3C. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on January 31, 2019. (AYB)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Courtney L Breeden (Lee, Alan)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 01/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
January 30, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (AMP)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Wakefield & Associates, Inc..(Grisham, Arthur)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Fisher, Russell)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/13/2018. (JCK)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/13/2018. (JCK)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/13/2018. (JCK)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (JCK)
December 13, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (JCK)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3838216.), filed by Courtney L Breeden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Coll Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Coll Ltr, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breeden v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Arthur C Grisham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney L Breeden
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?