Birchfield v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al (RLJ2)

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Birchfield
Defendant: Chase Bank USA NA, Chase Bank Acquisition Trust, Select Portfolio Services, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Premier Mortgage Funding
Case Number: 2:2019cv00005
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Clifton L Corker
1 Judge: R Leon Jordan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1461
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacqueline Birchfield. (JCK)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chase Bank Acquisition Trust, Chase Bank USA NA. (Haltom, James)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacqueline Birchfield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAT)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chase Bank Acquisition Trust, Chase Bank USA NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust for Primary Note, #2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust for Secondary-Lien Note, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment of Primary Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit D - First Case Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Second Case Docket and Pleadings, #6 Exhibit F - Bankruptcy Case Docket and Pleadings)(Haltom, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Chase Bank Acquisition Trust, Chase Bank USA NA. (Haltom, James)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Chase Bank Acquisition Trust, Chase Bank USA NA, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Premier Mortgage Funding, Select Portfolio Services (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Jacqueline Birchfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCK)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacqueline Birchfield. (JCK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birchfield v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al (RLJ2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA NA
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Represented By: John Thompson Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank Acquisition Trust
Represented By: James Auman Haltom
Represented By: John Thompson Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Mortgage Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Birchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?