Malone v. N.E.C.X et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Malone
Defendant: N.E.C.X, Georgia Crowell, J Stalcup, Freddy Roark and Alethia Lewis
Case Number: 2:2019cv00074
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have up to and including August 7, 2019, in which to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. There is no document to this entry. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/2/2019. (ASH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by J Stalcup. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed J Stalcup served on 6/17/2019. (JCK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alethia Lewis served on 6/17/2019. (JCK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Letter (unsigned) from Aaron Malone regarding Freddy Roark summons re #6 Letter from Aaron Malone with an incomplete summons. (Attachments: #1 USM form for Freddy Roark, #2 Envelope) (JCK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Alethia Lewis, J Stalcup. (Attachments: #1 Summons Alethia Lewis)(Given to USMS for service of process)(JCK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #6 Letter. Summons not completed. Please refile corrected and completed summons with a USM 285 form. (Blank service packet and administrative notice mailed to Aaron Malone)(JCK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Aaron Malone with an incomplete summons (Attachments: #1 Other Incomplete or Incorrect Summons, #2 Envelope) (JCK)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Aaron Malone, granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aaron Malone., 1. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] is GRANTED; 2. Northeast Correctional Complex and Georgia Crowell are DISMISSED as Defendants in this case; 3. Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel [Doc. 3] is DENIED; 4. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff service packets (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for Defendants Freddy Roark, J. Stalcup and Alethia Lewis. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/13/2019. (Copy of Memo and blank service packets mailed to Aaron Malone, Copy of Memo mailed to NECX custodian of inmate trust account, Copy of Memo served on Court's financial deputy via NEF) (JCK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (Copy of Notice mailed to Aaron Malone)(JCK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Aaron Malone. (JCK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Georgia Crowell, Alethia Lewis, N.E.C.X, Freddy Roark, J Stalcup (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Aaron Malone. (Attachments: #1 TDOC Inmate Grievances, #2 Envelope)(JCK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron Malone. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. N.E.C.X et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.E.C.X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Stalcup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddy Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alethia Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?