Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc. v. Loving et al

Plaintiff: Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc.
Defendant: Wendell Loving and William D. Jones
Case Number: 2:2019cv00075
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Clifton L Corker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to William D. Jones by Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc.. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1 - Affidavit of Kenneth Ward in Support of Application for Clerk's Default)(Ward, Kenneth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Wendell Loving by Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc.. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1 - Affidavit of Kenneth Ward in Support of Application for Clerk's Default)(Ward, Kenneth)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc.. William D. Jones served on 6/1/2019. (Ward, Kenneth)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc.. Wendell Loving served on 5/25/2019. (Ward, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Safeway Financial Holding Company, Corporate Parent Safeway Insurance Company for Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc.. (Ward, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 5/6/19. (AWS)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 5/6/19. (AWS)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 5/6/19. (AWS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jones)(AWS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Kenneth Ward re #1 Complaint, : requirements due by 5/13/2019. (AWS)
May 6, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (AWS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3963858.), filed by Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Safeway Insurance Policy, #3 Other Corp. Disclosure - Safeway Ins. Co., #4 Summons Summons - Loving, #5 Summons Summons - Jones)(Ward, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc. v. Loving et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell Loving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeway Insurance Company of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth W Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?