Shell v. Carter County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Shell
Defendant: Nurses, C.O at the Jail, Carter County Jail, John Doe Correctional Officer and Jane Doe Nurses
Case Number: 2:2019cv00086
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Clifton L Corker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Plaintiff is ORDERED to immediately inform the Court and Defendants or their counsel of record of any address changes in writing. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/23/2019. (BDG) Copy of this order and the complaint (Doc.2) mailed to the Sheriff of Carter County. Order mailed to Shell.
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy Shell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(BDG)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 6/4/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Shell, Custodian of inmate accounts, Attorney General for the State of Tennessee, and serviced to Court's financial deputy.
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Timothy Shell) (CAT)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against C.O at the Jail, Carter County Jail, Nurses (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Timothy Shell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope) (CAT)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Shell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Trust Fund Transactions, #3 Envelope) (CAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shell v. Carter County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O at the Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?