Tomblin v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Sarah Tomblin
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00089
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendant's counsel has notified the Court of a calendar conflict on the scheduling conference date of July 18, 2019. Accordingly, the scheduling sonference is rescheduled to Tuesday, July 30, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/01/2019. (AMP)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: A scheduling conference will be conducted on Thursday, July 18, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in the Court's chambers at the United States Courthouse, Greeneville, Tennessee. Participating counsel shall be prepared to engage in substantive discussion about the case, including the matters addressed in the Rule 26(f) report, legal theories and disputed facts, matters addressed by Rule 16, and possibilities for settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 07/01/2019. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable Clifton L. Corker, USMJ. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/28/19. (ABF)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harrison, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Walgreen Co. (Harrison, James)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The trial of this case will be held before the undersigned United States District Judge, with a jury, beginning on TUESDAY, DECEMBER 1, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Knoxville, Tennessee in Courtroom 3C. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on June 17, 2019. (AYB)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Walgreen Co..(Harrison, James)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 05/30/2019. (CAT)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 05/30/2019. (CAT)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 05/30/2019. (CAT)
May 30, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (CAT)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walgreen Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreen Co. for Walgreen Co.. (Harrison, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walgreen Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreen Co., Corporate Parent Walgreen Co. for Walgreen Co.. (Harrison, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County Circuit, case number 19-cv-192. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3985414), filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal of Case to Federal Court)(Harrison, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomblin v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: James W Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Tomblin
Represented By: Thomas C Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?