Arbogast v. Tusculum College
Plaintiff: Michelle D Arbogast
Defendant: Tusculum College
Case Number: 2:2019cv00114
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tusculum College.(Darden, Stephen)
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case pursuant to SO-19-13. (CNC)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Thomas A Varlan no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/09/2019. (CAT)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle D Arbogast. Tusculum College served on 8/2/2019. (Burkhalter, David)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/11/2019. (SAC)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/11/2019. (SAC)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/11/2019. (SAC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tusculum College. (SAC)
July 11, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (SAC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tusculum College ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4019426.), filed by Michelle D Arbogast. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Burkhalter, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arbogast v. Tusculum College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tusculum College
Represented By: Stephen M Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle D Arbogast
Represented By: David A Burkhalter, II
Represented By: Zachary J Burkhalter
Represented By: David Alexander Burkhalter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?