Daley v. Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Kristen Daley
Defendant: Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00124
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Clifton L Corker
2 Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and Defendant shall have an extension of time through October 3, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs complaint. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Carl, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case pursuant to SO 19-13. (AWS)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time To Respond by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Carl, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/17/2019. (SAC)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/17/2019. (SAC)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/17/2019. (SAC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (SAC)
July 17, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (SAC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4024634.), filed by Kristen Daley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Coll Ltr, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2nd Coll Ltr, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dispute Ltr, #4 Exhibit 4 - Response to Dispute Ltr, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - HRRG)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daley v. Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert R Carl, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Daley
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?