Worthy v. Southern Health Partners, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Brooke Elaine Casey and Paula Kaye Worthy
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc., Bethany Feezel, Kenneth Mathews, Stephanie Bitner and Bethany Feezell
Case Number: 2:2019cv00135
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Southern Health Partners, Inc.. (Ward, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/9/2019. (JCK)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (JCK)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Southern Health Partners, Inc.. (JCK)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stephanie Bitner(Nurse), Stephanie Bitner(Individually), Bethany Feezell(Individually), Bethany Feezell(Nurse), Kenneth Mathews(M.D.), Kenneth Mathews(Individually), Southern Health Partners, Inc..(Ward, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula Kaye Worthy. Kenneth Mathews(Individually) served on 8/19/2019. (Spurrell, Donald)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula Kaye Worthy. Bethany Feezell(Nurse) served on 8/19/2019. (Spurrell, Donald)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula Kaye Worthy. Stephanie Bitner(Nurse) served on 8/19/2019. (Spurrell, Donald)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #6 Affidavit of Service, #7 Affidavit of Service, #8 Affidavit of Service. Wrong event used. Requirements due by 8/27/2019. (JCK)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Dr. Kenneth Mathews on 08/19/2019, filed by Paula Kaye Worthy. (Spurrell, Donald)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Bethany Feezell on 08/19/2019, filed by Paula Kaye Worthy. (Spurrell, Donald)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Stephanie Bitner on 08/19/2019, filed by Paula Kaye Worthy. (Spurrell, Donald)
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case per SO 19-13. (KMK)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (KFB)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/25/19. (KFB)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/25/19. (KFB)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/25/19. (KFB)
July 24, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (KFB) Modified on 7/25/2019 (KFB).
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephanie Bitner, Bethany Feezel, Kenneth Mathews, Southern Health Partners, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4030775.), filed by Paula Kaye Worthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Spurrell, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worthy v. Southern Health Partners, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Feezel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Mathews
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Bitner
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Feezell
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Elaine Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Kaye Worthy
Represented By: Donald E Spurrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?