Hammer v. Commissioner, Social Security of (TV1)
Plaintiff: Suzanne M Hammer
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security of and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00143
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suzanne M Hammer. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 8/19/2019. (Williams, Vernon)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re IFP Service (ABF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ABF)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States Marshal, or the plaintiff, shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon all defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. If the United States Marshal provides the service, all costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. If the plaintiff provides his/her own service, the plaintiff will bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/13/19. (ABF)
August 9, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AML)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Suzanne M Hammer. (Williams, Vernon)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security of, filed by Suzanne M Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Williams, Vernon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammer v. Commissioner, Social Security of (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M Hammer
Represented By: Vernon M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?